Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5344 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 3, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 11, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 15, 2023
Analysis May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Amendments Printing

Bill
Fiscal Note
Analysis

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2023
Bill May 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2023
Fiscal Note May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note April 25, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023

Conference Committee Report

Fiscal Note