Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1960
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1960
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1873
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4318
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4097
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1580
|
Journal Page: 4097
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4097
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4097
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4073
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Frazier
|
Journal Page: 4073
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4073
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 2915
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1960
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1385
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|