Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5363 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/02/2023 2:00 pm
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/25/2023 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 25 2023 1:56PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule