Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB537 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/15/2023 10:30 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Considered in Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23