Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5370 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/20/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Harris of Anderson (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 5370
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 10, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the juvenile board of Navarro
 County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 152.1811(a), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The juvenile board of Navarro County is composed of the
 county judge, the district judges in Navarro County, the judges of
 the county courts at law in the county, and the criminal district
 attorney. The juvenile board may appoint five public members to
 serve on the board without salary for a term determined by the
 board.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *