Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5372 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 6, 2023
Analysis May 5, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 11, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Analysis May 21, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Amendments Printing

Bill
Fiscal Note
Analysis

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note May 21, 2023
Fiscal Note May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note April 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis May 5, 2023