Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 4609
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3860
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1308
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3491
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3491
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3075
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 1628
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|