House | 05/04/2023 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 3212 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1923 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1923 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Filed |