House | 05/08/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2907 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1923 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1923 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Filed |