Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1875
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4318
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4107
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1584
|
Journal Page: 4106
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4106
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4106
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3971
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3971
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3250
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Withdrawn from calendar (contested)
|
|
Journal Page: 3250
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2792
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1845
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1923
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1923
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|