E
|
06/13/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/13/2023
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6492
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 6490
|
E
|
05/28/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3177
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5890
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5896
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5302
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2393
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2246
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4998
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1845
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 4622
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4622
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4317
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3061
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|