Senate | 05/16/2023 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1958 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1958 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1862 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4317 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4089 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1580 | Journal Page: 4089 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4089 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4089 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 4058 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4058 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3713 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1958 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 332 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |