Senate | 04/26/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1356 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1356 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1314 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2196 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1957 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Record vote | RV#463 | Journal Page: 1957 |
House | 04/25/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1957 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Amended | 1-Raymond | Journal Page: 1956 |
House | 04/25/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1956 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1914 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1914 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 987 | |
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1356 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 334 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |