Senate | 05/10/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1484 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1484 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1071 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Record vote | RV#318 | Journal Page: 1658 |
House | 04/19/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1621 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Amended | 1-M. Gonzlez | Journal Page: 1621 |
House | 04/18/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1621 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 975 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1484 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 334 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |