Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB59 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 13, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 5, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 8, 2023
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note
Bill
Analysis

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note May 6, 2023
Fiscal Note March 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023