Senate | 03/30/2023 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 703 | |
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 703 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 682 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 975 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 935 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Record vote | RV#66 | Journal Page: 934 |
House | 03/29/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 934 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 934 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 921 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 921 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Record vote | RV#61 | Journal Page: 920 |
House | 03/28/2023 | Amendment fails of adoption | 1-C. Bell, Harrison, and Leo-Wilson | Journal Page: 920 |
House | 03/28/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 920 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 663 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 703 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 335 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |