LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB600
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB600
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB600
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/22/2023
8:00 am
Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.014
HB600
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Considered in Calendars
HB1651
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Finance
HB1758
Introduced
Last Action: 03/22/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB3056
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB3493
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
HJR2
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/30/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State