Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB611 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 7, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 18, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note February 28, 2023