Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB614 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2023

                    By: Shaheen (Senate Sponsor - Springer) H.B. No. 614
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2023;
 May 11, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 22, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1; May 22, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 BettencourtX
 SpringerX
 EckhardtX
 GutierrezX
 HallX
 NicholsX
 ParkerX
 PaxtonX
 WestX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to property owners' association fines.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 209, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Section 209.0061 to read as follows:
 Sec. 209.0061.  ASSOCIATION POLICY; FINES. (a) This
 section does not apply to a property owners' association that is not
 authorized by the association's dedicatory instrument to levy a
 fine.
 (b)  A property owners' association board shall adopt an
 enforcement policy regarding the levying of fines by the property
 owners' association. The policy must include:
 (1)  general categories of restrictive covenants for
 which the association may assess fines;
 (2)  a schedule of fines for each category of
 violation; and
 (3)  information regarding hearings described by
 Section 209.007.
 (c)  The enforcement policy adopted pursuant to Subsection
 (b) may reserve the board's authority to levy a fine from the
 schedule of fines that varies on a case-by-case basis.
 (d)  Each property owners' association shall:
 (1)  provide a copy of the policy to an owner of each
 property in the subdivision by:
 (A)  posting the policy on an Internet website
 maintained by the property owners' association or an agent acting
 on behalf of the association and accessible to members of the
 association; or
 (B)  annually sending a copy of the policy,
 separately or included in routine communication from the property
 owners' association to property owners, by:
 (i)  hand delivery to the owner;
 (ii)  first class mail to the owner's last
 known mailing address; or
 (iii)  e-mail to an e-mail address provided
 to the property owners' association by the owner; and
 (2)  make the policy available on any publicly
 accessible Internet website maintained by the property owners'
 association or an agent acting on behalf of the association.
 SECTION 2.  Section 209.0061, Property Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a fine that becomes due on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A fine that becomes due before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2024.
 * * * * *