Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB614 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 3, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 21, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2023
Fiscal Note March 22, 2023
Fiscal Note March 12, 2023