E | 06/12/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 06/12/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6491 | |
E | 05/26/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5975 | |
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2994 | |
House | 05/25/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5614 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5303 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4992 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2385 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2385 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2385 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2385 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2384 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2384 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2384 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2425 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2326 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2239 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2130 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1484 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1484 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 772 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1048 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 995 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Record vote | RV#78 | Journal Page: 994 |
House | 04/04/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 994 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 994 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 980 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 980 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 923 | |
House | 03/21/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1484 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Health Care Reform, Select | Journal Page: 337 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |