House | 05/08/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3401 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 502 | Journal Page: 3401 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 337 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 337 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |