Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB628 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/11/2023

                    By: Harris of Anderson, Gamez H.B. No. 628
 (Senate Sponsor - Nichols)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2023;
 May 2, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 11, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 11, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 WestX
 AlvaradoX
 EckhardtX
 HancockX
 KingX
 MilesX
 ParkerX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to issuance of specialty license plates to honor fallen
 law enforcement officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.680 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.680.  FALLEN LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER LICENSE
 PLATES. (a) The department shall issue specialty license plates to
 honor law enforcement officers killed in the line of duty. The
 license plates must include:
 (1)  the words "A Hero Remembered Never Dies";
 (2)  the words "Honoring Law Enforcement"; and
 (3)  a depiction of a badge covered by a black mourning
 band.
 (b)  After deduction of the department's administrative
 costs, the remainder of the fee for issuance of the license plates
 shall be deposited to the credit of an account created by the
 comptroller in the manner provided by Section 504.6012(b). Money
 deposited to that account may be used only by the Employees
 Retirement System of Texas to provide financial assistance to
 surviving family members of peace officers killed in the line of
 duty under Chapter 615, Government Code.
 (c)  Section 504.702 does not apply to a specialty license
 plate issued under this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *