House
|
05/08/2023
|
Postponed
|
8/17/24 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3429
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 40, and Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3429
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Postponed 8/17/24 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Frank
|
Journal Page: 3429
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Amended 1-Frank
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3428
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2791
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Health Care Reform, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
House
|
11/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|