Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB640 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/27/2023 10:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Finance
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/14/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Local Government