House | 05/11/2023 | Postponed | 6/1/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 4040 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) | Journal Page: 4040 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c) | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 4040 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Postponed After HB 3159 | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Postponed | 5/11/23 4:00 PM | Journal Page: 3846 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3846 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2468 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 339 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 339 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |