House | 04/24/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1886 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 838 | Journal Page: 1886 |
House | 04/24/2023 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 975 | |
House | 03/23/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select | Journal Page: 341 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 341 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |