Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB692 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 15, 2022
Bill November 15, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 16, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 4, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2023
Bill April 16, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 14, 2023