E
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6490
|
E
|
05/24/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5620
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4980
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4998
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4703
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4704
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1875
|
Journal Page: 4703
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4703
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4556
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1750
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 967
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1417
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#184
|
Journal Page: 1416
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1416
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1416
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1371
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amended
|
1-C. Bell
|
Journal Page: 1370
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1370
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 343
|
House
|
11/15/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|