Senate | 04/06/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 808 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1286 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1038 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Record vote | RV#96 | Journal Page: 1037 |
House | 04/05/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1037 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Amended | 1-Rose, Leach, and Moody | Journal Page: 1033 |
House | 04/05/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1032 | |
House | 03/30/2023 | Postponed | 4/5/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 970 |
House | 03/30/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 970 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 941 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Record vote | RV#68 | Journal Page: 940 |
House | 03/29/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 940 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Point of order sustained (amendment) | Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 939 |
House | 03/29/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Tinderholt | Journal Page: 938 |
House | 03/29/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 936 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 813 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 357 | |
House | 02/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 357 | |
House | 11/16/2022 | Filed |