E
|
06/17/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6492
|
E
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5975
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2994
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5615
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5303
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5136
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2327
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 916
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 916
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1030
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#92
|
Journal Page: 1030
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1030
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1030
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1005
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#85
|
Journal Page: 1004
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1004
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Rose
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 916
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 358
|
House
|
11/16/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|