Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB755 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2022
Bill November 17, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 19, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note April 9, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2023