House | 05/06/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3346 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 361 | |
House | 02/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 361 | |
House | 11/18/2022 | Filed |