Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1781 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1781 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1700 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3859 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1353 | Journal Page: 3585 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3585 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3585 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3449 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3449 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1928 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1781 | |
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 362 | |
House | 11/21/2022 | Filed |