Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2784 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | RV#907 | Journal Page: 2784 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2784 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Howard, et al. | Journal Page: 2784 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Amendment withdrawn 1-Howard, et al. | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 2784 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | Journal Page: 2718 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Failed to pass | Journal Page: 2705 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Amended | 1-Howard, Goodwin, Hinojosa, Flores, Talarico, Cole, and Troxclair | Journal Page: 2705 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2705 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2564 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2564 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Amended | 1-Lujan | Journal Page: 2563 |
House | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2563 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1048 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1920 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |