Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB783 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 21, 2022
Bill November 21, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 4, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 19, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023