Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB784 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 22, 2022
Bill November 22, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 31, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 15, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 18, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis
Bill
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 22, 2023
Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill March 31, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023