E
|
05/23/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5303
|
E
|
05/11/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4045
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4049
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3710
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1543
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 966
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 966
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 878
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1396
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1326
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#141
|
Journal Page: 1326
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1326
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1326
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1297
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1297
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 966
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 363
|
House
|
11/22/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|