Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB795 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/04/2023 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23