Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB796 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/01/2023 9:30 am
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 12 2023 12:02AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Referred to Urban Affairs: May 10 2023 10:27PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 11 2023 5:04PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 15 2023 4:58PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Referred to Natural Resources: May 12 2023 12:02AM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Referred to Land & Resource Management: May 17 2023 4:04PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Referred to Urban Affairs: May 10 2023 1:53AM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
04/05/2023
HB4
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/04/2023
HB4
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
04/04/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB4
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
03/06/2023 10:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to Finance
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Co-sponsor authorized
Introduced
Last Action: 03/06/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Failed of adoption
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Local Government