Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB799 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/11/2023 10:30 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice