LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB828
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB828
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB828
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/13/2023
2:30 pm
Youth Health & Safety, Select Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.026
HB195
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/25/2023 S Referred to Education
HB473
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
HB669
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB828
Introduced
Last Action: 03/13/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB1147
Introduced
Last Action: 03/13/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB1157
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/18/2023 S Left pending in committee
HB1358
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/18/2023 S Referred to Education