LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB834
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB834
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB834
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/04/2023
2:00 pm
Urban Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.028
HB834
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1153
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Local Government
HB1434
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
HB1492
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB1661
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1677
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
HB2822
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Received from the House
HB3980
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB4227
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB4443
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
HB4769
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB4770
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB5282
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB5311
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23