Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB842 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2022
Bill December 1, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 27, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis April 24, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 26, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note March 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 6, 2023