House | 05/12/2023 | Corrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 4220 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4049 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2774 | |
House | 03/01/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 401 | |
House | 03/01/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 401 | |
House | 12/01/2022 | Filed |