Senate | 05/04/2023 | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres | Journal Page: 1576 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1576 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1495 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2915 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2707 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | RV#869 | Journal Page: 2707 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2707 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2707 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2564 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2564 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1529 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1576 | |
House | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 402 | |
House | 12/02/2022 | Filed |