Senate | 05/12/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1855 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1855 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1820 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3907 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1521 | Journal Page: 3907 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3907 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3907 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3833 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3833 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) | Journal Page: 3833 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3833 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1855 | |
House | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 12/07/2022 | Filed |