E
|
06/13/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/13/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5975
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2994
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3061
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5615
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5620
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5289
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Eckhardt
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Eckhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2539
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1197
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1841
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#351
|
Journal Page: 1743
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote RV#351
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#334
|
Journal Page: 1693
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1693
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
4-Murr
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
4-Murr
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered 4-Murr
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Record vote RV#333
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
3-Reynolds
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-Reynolds
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Record vote RV#332
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Patterson
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Public hearing continued on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 555
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|