Senate | 05/08/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1615 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3346 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3088 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Record vote | RV#1086 | Journal Page: 3087 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3087 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3087 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3019 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Record vote | RV#1056 | Journal Page: 3018 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3018 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3018 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1286 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 405 | |
House | 03/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 405 | |
House | 12/08/2022 | Filed |