Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB909 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/04/2023 10:30 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23